MO HB1250 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Missouri Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act, which allows fiduciaries to access electronic records of the account holder

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Missouri Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act, which allows fiduciaries to access electronic records of the account holder

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1250 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1250 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1250 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-30HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 131 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseTaken Up
2018-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H)
2018-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2018-05-17SenateTaken Up
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-07SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-07SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2018-04-05SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 9, 2018, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-03-15SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2018-03-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-07HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
2018-03-07HouseTaken Up
2018-02-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-02-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating to trust and estates
2018-02-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-24HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-23HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-16HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback