MO HB122 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the current allowance permitting vehicles hauling solid waste to exceed weight limitations to vehicles hauling recyclable waste
Title
Extends the current allowance permitting vehicles hauling solid waste to exceed weight limitations to vehicles hauling recyclable waste
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB122&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0122I.htm |