MO HB12 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the certification of juveniles for trial as adults
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the certification of juveniles for trial as adults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-08-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-08-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-08-12 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2020-08-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-07-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |