MO HB1193 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to establish cord blood collection sites across the state for transportation to the Saint Louis Cord Blood Bank
Title
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to establish cord blood collection sites across the state for transportation to the Saint Louis Cord Blood Bank
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Roorda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Health Care Policy(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |