MO HB1192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that at least one member on the Missouri State Board of Nursing be an advanced practice registered nurse
Title
Requires that at least one member on the Missouri State Board of Nursing be an advanced practice registered nurse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1192&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/2334H.01I.pdf |