MO HB1184 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Reported to the House with... (H) - SS
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Reported to the House with... (H) - SS
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows foster children who are 16 years of age or older to contract for the purchase of automobile insurance with the consent of the Children's Division or the juvenile court
Title
Allows foster children who are 16 years of age or older to contract for the purchase of automobile insurance with the consent of the Children's Division or the juvenile court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass Consent (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 8:00am. Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Pensions(S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 2 |
2014-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |