MO HB1169 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-19 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-19 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to required disclosures for certain products
Title
Creates provisions relating to required disclosures for certain products
Sponsors
Rep. Holly Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2023-02-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |