MO HB1165 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to the Uniform Commercial Code
Title
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to the Uniform Commercial Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2023-04-06 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2023-04-03 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 5 |
2023-03-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2023-02-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |