MO HB1157 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against health care professionals who refuse to assist in medical procedures or treatments relating to sex reassignment or gender identity transitioning
Title
Prohibits discrimination against health care professionals who refuse to assist in medical procedures or treatments relating to sex reassignment or gender identity transitioning
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Hudson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |