MO HB1134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to state employee health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to state employee health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - HB 1134 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1, AMENDED 2 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws and Pensions(S) |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-04-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |