MO HB1123 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the licensure and inspection of hospitals
Title
Changes the laws regarding the licensure and inspection of hospitals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-17 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-10 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 2, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-22 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-03-08 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-08 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-09 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-27 | Prefiled (H) |