MO HB1117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri and Midwest Rail Integration and Improvement Commission Act and the Missouri and Midwest Rail Integration and Improvement Commission
Title
Establishes the Missouri and Midwest Rail Integration and Improvement Commission Act and the Missouri and Midwest Rail Integration and Improvement Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 002 | |
2012-04-23 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-29 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-22 | Prefiled (H) |