MO HB1114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Taney County, upon voter approval of a county sales tax, to appoint an emergency services board to administer the central dispatching of emergency services
Title
Requires Taney County, upon voter approval of a county sales tax, to appoint an emergency services board to administer the central dispatching of emergency services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1 | |
2012-05-18 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1 | |
2012-05-18 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2012-05-18 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-16 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, NOON, SENAT LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2012-03-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 004 | |
2012-02-23 | Perfected by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-22 | Prefiled (H) |