MO HB1113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person 60 years of age or older to renew a nondriver's identification without being physically present at the license bureau under specified conditions
Title
Allows a person 60 years of age or older to renew a nondriver's identification without being physically present at the license bureau under specified conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1113&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1113I.htm |