MO HB111 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies the representation that collective bargaining units can provide within the bi-state development agency
Title
Specifies the representation that collective bargaining units can provide within the bi-state development agency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House: HB 111 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: HB 111 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: HB 111 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |