MO HB1083 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits all drivers, regardless of age, from text messaging while operating a moving vehicle unless the device being used is equipped with technology allowing for voice-recognition hands-free texting
Title
Prohibits all drivers, regardless of age, from text messaging while operating a moving vehicle unless the device being used is equipped with technology allowing for voice-recognition hands-free texting
Sponsors
Rep. Don Wells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-15 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1083&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1083I.htm |