MO HB1078 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the early parole of certain offenders over the age of sixty-five.
Title
Authorizes the early parole of certain offenders over the age of sixty-five.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1078&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2250H.01I.pdf |