MO HB1075 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding unclaimed property
Title
Changes the laws regarding unclaimed property
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Miller [R] | Rep. John Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-09 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 131 NOES: 19 |
2014-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 10 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 142 NOES: 8 |
2014-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:15pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 18 |
2014-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |