MO HB106 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of elementary and secondary education to establish language developmental milestones for children who are deaf or hard of hearing
Title
Requires the department of elementary and secondary education to establish language developmental milestones for children who are deaf or hard of hearing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-03-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |