MO HB105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-20 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-20 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the withholding tax filing requirements for certain small businesses
Title
Changes the laws regarding the withholding tax filing requirements for certain small businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB105&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0105I.htm |