MO HB1039 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms.
Title
Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1039&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2160H.01I.pdf |