MO HB1007 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the use of hemp oil for the treatment of certain impairments
Title
Permits the use of hemp oil for the treatment of certain impairments
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |