MN SF972 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - House conferees Stephenson; Long; Hollins; Acomb; O'Driscoll
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus commerce policy and finance bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus commerce policy and finance bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House: S.F. NO. 972 (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 69 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 74 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 76 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 56 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 71 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateHouse conferees Stephenson; Long; Hollins; Acomb; O'Driscoll
2021-04-22SenateSenate conferees Dahms; Senjem; Utke; Mathews; Frentz
2021-04-22SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2021-04-22SenateReturned from House with amendment
2021-04-22HouseHouse conferees Stephenson, Long, Hollins, Acomb, O'Driscoll
2021-04-22HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
2021-04-22HouseSenate conferees Dahms; Senjem; Utke; Mathews; Frentz
2021-04-22HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2021-04-21HouseBill was passed as amended
2021-04-21HouseThird reading as amended
2021-04-21HousePoint of order raised multiple points of order
2021-04-21HouseAmended
2021-04-21HouseMotion prevailed
2021-04-21HouseMotion to take from table
2021-04-20HouseMotion prevailed
2021-04-20HouseMotion to lay on the table
2021-04-20HouseReported to the House
2021-04-17HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 20, 2021
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading
2021-04-16HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2021-04-15HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1031
2021-04-15HouseReceived from Senate
2021-04-14SenateThird reading Passed
2021-04-14SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading
2021-04-12SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2021-04-07SenateAuthor added Senjem
2021-04-06SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2021-02-11SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2021-02-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1031 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF0972&ssn=0&y=2021
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF972&version=0&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF972&version=1&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF972&version=2&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF972&version=3&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls92&number=2839
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=186
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=187
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=188
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=189
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=190
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=191
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=192
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=193
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=194
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=195
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=196
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=197
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=198
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=199
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=200
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=201
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=202
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=SF0972&session_number=0&year=2021&id=203

Bill Comments 750

feedback