MN SF959 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Fischer; Heintzeman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Fischer; Heintzeman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus environment and natural resources policy and finance bill
Title
Omnibus environment and natural resources policy and finance bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 69 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 66 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 69 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Appeal Ruling (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 66 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Fischer; Heintzeman |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Ruud; Eichorn; Tomassoni; Westrom |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2021-04-26 | House | House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Fischer; Heintzeman |
2021-04-26 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2021-04-26 | House | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Ruud; Eichorn; Tomassoni; Westrom |
2021-04-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-22 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-22 | House | Point of order raised multiple points of order |
2021-04-22 | House | Amended |
2021-04-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-19 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1076 |
2021-04-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Author added Ruud |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1076 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Author added Bernardy