MN SF955 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pawnbrokers pledged goods return regulations; location restrictions near gambling casinos repeal
Title
Pawnbrokers pledged goods return regulations; location restrictions near gambling casinos repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Brown [R] | Sen. Dave Thompson [R] | Sen. Chris Gerlach [R] | Rep. Tim Sanders [R] |
Rep. Michael Beard [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - Passage (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Governor approval | |
2011-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 82 | |
2011-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2011-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Returned from House |
2011-05-21 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-2 |
2011-05-21 | House | Third reading |
2011-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-16 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-16 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2011-05-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1152 |
2011-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 60-5 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | General Orders: To pass |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2011-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |