MN SF948 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Building and construction contracts requirements modification and clarification
Title
Building and construction contracts requirements modification and clarification
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF879 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Author added Heinrich