MN HF879 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Heinrich
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Heinrich
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Building and construction contract requirements modified and clarified.
Title
Building and construction contract requirements modified and clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2019-03-27 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SF948 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy