MN SF901 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the maximum term of incarceration for a gross misdemeanor at 364 days
Title
Establishing the maximum term of incarceration for a gross misdemeanor at 364 days
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF614 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Second reading