MN SF847 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Author added Cwodzinski
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Author added Cwodzinski
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Emblems Redesign Commission establishment
Title
State Emblems Redesign Commission establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Author added Cwodzinski |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Authors added Marty; Fateh |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF284 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Authors added Jordan, Keeler, Frazier, Pinto, Noor, Lee, Reyer, Becker-Finn, Youakim, Boldon, Elkins, Long, Schultz, Liebling, and Pryor