MN HF284 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Jordan, Keeler, Frazier, Pinto, Noor, Lee, Reyer, Becker-Finn, Youakim, Boldon, Elkins, Long, Schultz, Liebling, and Pryor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Jordan, Keeler, Frazier, Pinto, Noor, Lee, Reyer, Becker-Finn, Youakim, Boldon, Elkins, Long, Schultz, Liebling, and Pryor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State flag and state seal redesign commission created, and report required.
Title
State flag and state seal redesign commission created, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Authors added Jordan, Keeler, Frazier, Pinto, Noor, Lee, Reyer, Becker-Finn, Youakim, Boldon, Elkins, Long, Schultz, Liebling, and Pryor |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Fischer |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF847 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Author added Cwodzinski