MN SF783 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community education advisory council responsibilities modification; general community education revenue calculation and allowable uses modification; appropriation
Title
Community education advisory council responsibilities modification; general community education revenue calculation and allowable uses modification; appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF966 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy