MN SF754 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF608
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

St. Louis county civil service commission provisions modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Louis county civil service commission provisions modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF608
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading
2019-02-21SenateComm report: To pass
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Local Government
2019-01-31SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF608 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 9 04/12/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback