MN HF608 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 9 04/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

St. Louis County Civil Service Commission amended, technical changes made, and obsolete language removed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Louis County Civil Service Commission amended, technical changes made, and obsolete language removed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: McDonald motion - Re-Referral (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Re-Referral (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23 Secretary of State Chapter 9 04/12/2019
2019-04-12 Governor's action Approval
2019-04-12 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-04-12 Governor approval
2019-04-12 Presented to Governor
2019-04-08HouseReturned from Senate
2019-04-08SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateSpecial Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
2019-03-13SenateSecond reading
2019-03-13SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF754
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF754, now on General Orders
2019-03-11SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-11SenateReceived from House
2019-03-07HouseBill was passed
2019-03-07HouseMotion did not prevail
2019-03-07HouseMotion to re-refer Government Operations
2019-03-07HouseThird reading
2019-03-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-02-27HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-21HouseSecond reading
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF754 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF608

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0608&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF608&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF608&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0608&session_number=0&year=2019&id=58
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0608&session_number=0&year=2019&id=59
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=2253
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0608&session_number=0&year=2019&id=58
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0608&session_number=0&year=2019&id=59

Bill Comments

feedback