MN SF75 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Cell phone use while driving provisions modifications; texting while driving penalties increase; improper use of wireless communications devices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cell phone use while driving provisions modifications; texting while driving penalties increase; improper use of wireless communications devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-04-08HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
2019-04-08HouseReceived from Senate
2019-04-08SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateSpecial Order
2019-03-20SenateSecond reading
2019-03-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-02-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-01-28SenateAuthor added Hall
2019-01-28SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-01-17SenateAuthor added Jensen
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF104 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Author added Franson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback