MN HF104 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Author added Franson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cell phones; texting while driving penalties increased and wireless communications device forfeiture authorized, improper use of wireless communications device while driving crimes provided to be non-payable offenses, criminal vehicular operation crime expanded, driver education and driver's manual required to cover distracted driving, and rulemaking authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cell phones; texting while driving penalties increased and wireless communications device forfeiture authorized, improper use of wireless communications device while driving crimes provided to be non-payable offenses, criminal vehicular operation crime expanded, driver education and driver's manual required to cover distracted driving, and rulemaking authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseAuthor added Franson
2019-03-27HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-26HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Gruenhagen
2019-01-22HouseAuthors added Bennett and Lucero
2019-01-17HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF75 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback