MN SF746 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drivers license applications emergency contacts disclosure authorization
Title
Drivers license applications emergency contacts disclosure authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF932 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Mariani