MN HF932 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Mariani
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency contacts disclosure on driver's license applications authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency contacts disclosure on driver's license applications authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Mariani
2019-03-13HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Masin
2019-03-08HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF746 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback