MN SF723 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - HF passed, no substitution HF888
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - HF passed, no substitution HF888
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus environment and natural resources appropriations and policy bill
Title
Omnibus environment and natural resources appropriations and policy bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | HF passed, no substitution HF888 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Laid on table |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-30 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF888 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 42