MN SF72 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - HF substituted on General Orders HF262
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - HF substituted on General Orders HF262
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Contract for deed documents memorials registrar retention requirement; city, county, and town approval of plats modification
Title
Contract for deed documents memorials registrar retention requirement; city, county, and town approval of plats modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF262 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF262 (Similar To) 2015-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/14/15