MN HF262 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/14/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/14/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Plat approval by government modified, new certificate by examiner's directive authorized after cancellation of contract for deed, new certificate of possessory interest by directive authorized after cancellation of contract for deed, and apportionment of estate taxes provided.
Title
Plat approval by government modified, new certificate by examiner's directive authorized after cancellation of contract for deed, new certificate of possessory interest by directive authorized after cancellation of contract for deed, and apportionment of estate taxes provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 94 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/14/15 | |
2015-05-14 | Governor's action Approval | |
2015-05-14 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2015-05-14 | Governor approval | |
2015-05-12 | Presented to Governor | |
2015-05-11 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 94-32 |
2015-05-11 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2015-05-11 | House | Motion prevailed |
2015-05-11 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2015-05-11 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2015-05-11 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF72 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF72, now on General Orders |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill was passed vote: 128-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Third reading |
2015-02-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-01-29 | House | Second reading |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices |
Same As/Similar To
SF72 (Similar To) 2015-03-04 - HF substituted on General Orders HF262