MN SF704 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Child maltreatment reports screening guidelines compliance requirements; county record retention of repeated reports of maltreatment requirement
Title
Child maltreatment reports screening guidelines compliance requirements; county record retention of repeated reports of maltreatment requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and returned to author |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |