MN SF648 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF827
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF827
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
72-hour emergency hold notice of release or discharge notice limitation specification
Title
72-hour emergency hold notice of release or discharge notice limitation specification
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF827 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF827 (Similar To) 2017-05-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 85