MN SF638 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF740
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF740
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle franchise successor agreements; vehicle manufacturers, distributors and factory branches unfair practices establishment
Title
Motor vehicle franchise successor agreements; vehicle manufacturers, distributors and factory branches unfair practices establishment
Sponsors
Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF740 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF740 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 203