MN HF740 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle franchises regulated; warranty and recall obligations specified; unfair practices and succession agreements by manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches regulated; and penalties provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle franchises regulated; warranty and recall obligations specified; unfair practices and succession agreements by manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches regulated; and penalties provided.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Secretary of State Chapter 203
2018-05-29 Governor's action Approval
2018-05-29 Secretary of State, Filed
2018-05-29 Governor approval
2018-05-21 Presented to Governor
2018-05-20SenateThird reading vote: 67-0
2018-05-20SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2018-05-20SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2018-05-20SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2018-05-20HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2018-05-20HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 126-1
2018-05-20HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2018-05-20HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2018-05-20HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2018-02-22HouseSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen, Dahms, Housley, Weber, Frentz
2018-02-22HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
2018-02-20SenateSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Dahms; Housley; Weber; Frentz
2018-02-20SenateSenate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
2018-02-20SenateHouse conferees Vogel; Hoppe; Loonan; Kresha; Halverson
2018-02-20SenateBill returned to conference committee
2018-02-20SenateTaken from table in House
2018-02-20HouseHouse conferees Vogel, Hoppe, Loonan, Kresha, and Halverson.
2018-02-20HouseNew conference committee of 5 requested
2018-02-20HouseMotion prevailed
2018-02-20HouseMotion to take from table
2017-05-20HouseSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen, Dahms, Housley, Weber, Frentz
2017-05-20HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
2017-05-19SenateSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Dahms; Housley; Weber; Frentz
2017-05-17HouseHouse conferees Vogel, Hoppe, Loonan, Kresha, Halverson
2017-05-17HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2017-05-17HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2017-05-17SenateHouse conferees Vogel; Hoppe; Loonan; Kresha; Halverson
2017-05-17SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2017-05-16SenateThird reading Passed vote: 62-0
2017-05-16SenateSpecial Order
2017-05-10SenateSecond reading
2017-05-10SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF638
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF638, now on General Orders
2017-05-09SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-09SenateReceived from House
2017-05-08HouseBill was passed vote: 118-4
2017-05-08HouseThird reading
2017-05-04HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 8, 2017.
2017-05-04HouseAuthor added Dettmer.
2017-03-13HouseSecond reading
2017-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2017-03-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
2017-02-16HouseAuthors added Applebaum and Jessup.
2017-02-02HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF638 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF740

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0740&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF740&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF740&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF740&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF740&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0740&session_number=0&year=2017&id=231
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=5293
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0740&session_number=0&year=2017&id=621
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=10418

Bill Comments

feedback