MN SF610 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Mitchell
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Mitchell
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care center and family child care provider adoption of a policy regarding immunizations authorization
Title
Child care center and family child care provider adoption of a policy regarding immunizations authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Author added Mitchell |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Author added Mann |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Author stricken Hoffman |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF367 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Authors added Coulter and Hemmingsen-Jaeger