MN SF574 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Coleman
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Coleman
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sports wagering commission establishment; regulation and taxation of sports wagering authorization
Title
Sports wagering commission establishment; regulation and taxation of sports wagering authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
Sen. Julia Coleman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Coleman |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF778 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration