MN HF778 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sports betting provided for and authorized, licenses established, local restrictions prohibited, sports betting taxation provided, civil and criminal penalties provided, amateur sports grants provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Sports betting provided for and authorized, licenses established, local restrictions prohibited, sports betting taxation provided, civil and criminal penalties provided, amateur sports grants provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Finance by motion |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-05-12 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-05-12 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-05-12 | House | Amended |
2022-05-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 12, 2022 |
2022-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2022-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Stephenson (as chief), Huot, Lislegard, Lillie added as co-authors |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF574 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Coleman