MN SF5048 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-03 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-03 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State-owned land oil and gas exploration and production leases facilitation; gas and oil regulatory framework recommendations to the legislature establishment; geologic carbon sequestration within the state report requirement; appropriating money
Title
State-owned land oil and gas exploration and production leases facilitation; gas and oil regulatory framework recommendations to the legislature establishment; geologic carbon sequestration within the state report requirement; appropriating money
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF5350 (Similar To) 2024-04-26 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration