MN SF50 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Author added Ingebrigtsen
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small brewers packaging requirements modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small brewers packaging requirements modification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateAuthor added Ingebrigtsen
2021-02-18SenateAuthor added Pappas
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF121 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Author added Morrison

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback