MN HF121 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small brewer packaging requirements modified.
Title
Small brewer packaging requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. John Burkel [R] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Morrison |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Burkel |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Boe and Long |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Nash |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added O'Neill |
2021-01-21 | House | Author added Franson |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF50 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Author added Ingebrigtsen